MD SB182 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility requirements for recall of a former judge in Baltimore City, Charles County, Harford County, and Prince George's County for temporary assignment.
Title
Baltimore City and Charles, Prince George's, and Harford Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-23 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-14 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {838378/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Charles County
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Emergency Bills
Harford County
Judges
Prince George's County
Charles County
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Emergency Bills
Harford County
Judges
Prince George's County