MD SB182 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending through calendar year 2019 the authorization to use specified Purse Dedication Account funds generated from video lottery proceeds for operating assistance by the Ocean Downs Race Course and Rosecroft Raceway to support a minimum of 40 live racing days at each race course.
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-2) (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-2) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |