MD SB182 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange as a public corporation and an independent unit of State government; establishing the purposes, powers, and duties of the Exchange; establishing the Board of Trustees of the Exchange; providing for the qualifications, appointment, term, and removal of members of the Board; establishing the powers and duties of the Board; requiring the Board to appoint an Executive Director of the Exchange, with the approval of the Governor, and to determine the Executive Director's compensation; etc.
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange Act of 2011
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (106-29) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-29 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (34-11) | |
2011-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-26 | Laid Over (Senator Jacobs) Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-02-01 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) | |
2011-01-24 | First Reading Finance & Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Assessments
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Ethics
Federal Government
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Investigations and Inquiries
Laws and Ordinances
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Procurement
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
Small Business
State Employees
Tax Credits
Assessments
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Ethics
Federal Government
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Investigations and Inquiries
Laws and Ordinances
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Procurement
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
Small Business
State Employees
Tax Credits