MD SB182 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Board of License Commissioners in Prince George's County from issuing a new alcoholic beverages license on or after July 1, 2010, for use in a drive-through purchase facility in which alcoholic beverages are sold at retail and dispensed through a door or window to purchasers in or on a motor vehicle; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Drive-Through Purchase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-20 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
License Commissioners, Boards of
Motor Vehicles
Prince George`s County
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
License Commissioners, Boards of
Motor Vehicles
Prince George`s County