MD SB181 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a certain certificate filed with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation disclose an identification number assigned by the Department for the business associated with the certificate.
Title
Corporations and Associations - Trade Name Certificates - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {548576/1 Adopted |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m. |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Corporations and Associations
Identification
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Corporations and Associations
Identification
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Corporations and Associations | 1 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |