MD SB180 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual a credit against the State income tax equal to 50% of the renovation costs incurred during the taxable year to provide accessibility and visitability features to an existing home; providing that the credit may not exceed $5,000; requiring applicants to file a specified application and an amended return; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to administer the credit which may not exceed $1,000,000 in a calendar year; etc.
Title
Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Sponsors
Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {655969/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {179732/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Construction
Corporations
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Home Improvement
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Corporations
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Home Improvement
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income