MD SB18 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for up to $250 of expenses paid or incurred by a parent or guardian of a student in kindergarten through grade 12 during the 2021 taxable year for certain school supplies used by certain students participating in a home instruction program or virtual learning program conducted in response to the COVID-19 public health emergency; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – School Supplies for Home Instruction and Virtual Learning Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-22SenateHearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2020-10-01SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback