MD SB18 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from the sales and use tax sales of electricity, steam, or artificial or natural gas to a homeowners association for use in property owned or maintained by the homeowners association; and requiring the Comptroller, on or before October 1, 2016, to provide specified notice of the exemption authorized by the Act on the Comptroller's Web site.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Energy for Homeowners Association
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-09-18 | Senate | Pre-filed |