MD SB18 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding specified grounds on which the State Board of Dental Examiners may take specified disciplinary action against applicants for a license to practice dentistry or dental hygiene, licensed dentists, or licensed dental hygienists.
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Abuse
Bribery
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Discipline
Drugs
Forgery
Fraud
Harassment
Health Occupations
Licenses
Negligence
Patients
Substance Abuse
Teachers
Violence
Witnesses
Bribery
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Discipline
Drugs
Forgery
Fraud
Harassment
Health Occupations
Licenses
Negligence
Patients
Substance Abuse
Teachers
Violence
Witnesses