MD SB18 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Third Reading Failed (21-25)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Third Reading Failed (21-25)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a political subdivision to require inspections of multifamily dwellings with balconies at least every 10 years, beginning no later than 10 years after the balcony is constructed, to ensure that each balcony meets specified requirements; authorizing a political subdivision to conduct inspections, to authorize a third party to conduct inspections, or to require a specified professional inspector to conduct and certify the inspections in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Failed (21-25) (Y: 21 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Failed (21-25) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {943821/1 Adopted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {473424/1 Adopted |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Young) Adopted |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {473424/1 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Young) Adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Young) Adopted |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Young) Adopted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Forehand) Adopted |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Mathias) Adopted |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {764038/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2012-10-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Apartments
Building Codes
Codes
Counties
Fees
Grants
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Inspections
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Public Safety
Safety
Building Codes
Codes
Counties
Fees
Grants
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Inspections
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Public Safety
Safety