MD SB179 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide coverage for specified cancer chemotherapy under specified health insurance policies or contracts from imposing limits or cost sharing on coverage for orally administered cancer chemotherapy that are less favorable to an insured or enrollee than the limits or cost sharing on coverage for cancer chemotherapy that is administered intravenously or by injection; etc.
Title
Kathleen A. Mathias Chemotherapy Parity Act of 2012
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-09 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Pugh) Adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-06 | Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) 473929/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Favorable with Amendments 287877/3 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-01-20 | Hearing 2/1 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-20 | First Reading Finance |