MD SB178 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/9/2021) - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that an application for a certain no-knock search warrant be approved in writing by a police supervisor and the State's Attorney; requiring a certain no-knock search warrant to be executed between 8:00 a.m. and 7:00 p.m., absent exigent circumstances; requiring a certain custodian to allow inspection of certain records by certain persons; providing that a record relating to an administrative or criminal investigation of misconduct by a police officer is not a personnel record for certain purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Search Warrants and Inspection of Records Relating to Police Misconduct (Anton's Law)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - Senate - Overridden (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Overridden (Y: 90 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 88 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 893125/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 91 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 173228/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 86 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 893921/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 44 N: 84 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 723329/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 84 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 893223/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (Y: 50 N: 78 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 333525/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (Y: 30 N: 95 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 713820/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 104 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 363520/1 (Delegate Thiam) Rejected (Y: 50 N: 86 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 683223/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (Y: 57 N: 79 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 503029/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (Y: 46 N: 88 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Floor Amendment 113327/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Floor Amendment 633328/1 (Senator West) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Floor Amendment 663225/1 (Senator Beidle) Rejected (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-10HouseGubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/9/2021) - Chapter 62
2021-04-10HouseOverridden (90-46)
2021-04-10SenateOverridden (30-17)
2021-04-09SenateVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2021-04-07SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (30-17)
2021-04-07SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (88-46)
2021-04-06HouseFloor Amendment {893125/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (42-91)
2021-04-06HouseFloor Amendment {173228/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (42-86)
2021-04-06HouseFloor Amendment {893921/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (44-84)
2021-04-06HouseFloor Amendment {723329/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (42-84)
2021-04-06HouseFloor Amendment {893223/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (50-78)
2021-04-06HouseFloor Amendment {333525/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (30-95)
2021-04-06HouseFloor Amendment {713820/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (17-104)
2021-04-06HouseFloor Amendment {363520/1 (Delegate Thiam) Rejected (50-86)
2021-04-06HouseFloor Amendment {683223/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (57-79)
2021-04-06HouseFloor Amendment {503029/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (46-88)
2021-04-06HouseFloor Committee Amendment {423520/1 Adopted
2021-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-01HouseMotion Special Order until 04/02 (Delegate Krebs) Withdrawn
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments {562718/1 Adopted
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2021-04-01HouseHearing canceled
2021-04-01HouseHearing 4/01 at 2:30 p.m.
2021-03-12HouseHearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-04HouseReferred Judiciary
2021-03-03SenateThird Reading Passed (29-18)
2021-03-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-02SenateFloor Amendment {113327/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (21-26)
2021-03-02SenateFloor Amendment {633328/1 (Senator West) Rejected (17-30)
2021-03-02SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2021-03-02SenateFloor Amendment {663225/1 (Senator Beidle) Rejected (21-26)
2021-03-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {848971/1 Adopted
2021-02-26SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
2021-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {848971/1
2021-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-12-28SenateHearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2020-10-21SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB120 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-19 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions4101(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4311(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4351(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0178?ys=2021RS
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0178f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0178t.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0178e.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_62_sb0178e.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_84897101.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_66322501.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_63332801.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_11332701.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_56271801.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_68322301.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_42352001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_50302901.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_36352001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_71382001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_33352501.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_89322301.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_72332901.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_89392101.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_17322801.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0178_89312501.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0178_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0178_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0278.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0282.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0283.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0322.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1093.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1094.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1095.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1096.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1097.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1098.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1099.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1100.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1101.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1102.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1103.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0974.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1359.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1109.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback