MD SB177 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Fiscal Year 2017 Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program to provide rebates to individuals and entities that qualified for a rebate in fiscal year 2017 but did not receive it due to a limitation on the total amount of rebates to be issued in fiscal year 2017; limiting the rebate to applicants that applied for a rebate during fiscal year 2017; allowing a credit against the motor vehicle excise tax for certain qualified plug-in electric drive vehicles; etc.
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Fiscal Year 2017 Applicants
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Energy Matters
Equipment
Excise Tax
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Energy Matters
Equipment
Excise Tax
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration