MD SB176 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the eligibility for a retirement allowance for certain members of the Judges' Retirement System who reach the mandatory retirement age required by Article IV, ยง 3 of the Maryland Constitution and have less than 5 years of eligibility service.
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for Allowance
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 9:30 a.m. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |