MD SB175 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a provision that prohibits the Governor from appointing a member of the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland, a member of the Board of Directors of the Medical System Corporation, or an officer or a full-time employee of the Medical System Corporation or the University of Maryland, Baltimore Campus to the Emergency Medical Services Board; and prohibiting the Governor from appointing more than two persons in total from certain health systems and schools to the Emergency Medical Services Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204
2018-03-29SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-29SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
2018-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {856087/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-21HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-02-12SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-02-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-08SenateFloor Amendment {643129/1 (Senator King) Adopted
2018-02-07SenateSpecial Order until 2/8 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
2018-02-07SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-06SenateSpecial Order until 2/7 (Senator King) Adopted
2018-02-06SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2018-02-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {277674/1
2018-02-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-02-01SenateHearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-17SenateReassigned to Finance
2018-01-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0175&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0175f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0175t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0175e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_204_sb0175e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0175_27767401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0175_64312901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0175_85608701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb0175.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0175_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0211.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0175_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0885.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0919.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback