MD SB175 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Anne Arundel County Board of License Commissioners to remit a specified administrative fee to the Comptroller instead of using the fee to cover specified expenses; requiring the Board to remit to the Comptroller, rather than to Anne Arundel County, all fees that the Board collects; requiring the Comptroller, from specified fees, to approve and remit to the County amounts necessary to pay specified salaries, benefits and expenses and to remit the balance to the County for the general purposes of the County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Disposition of Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-49) (Y: 89 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-28SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
2016-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2016-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (89-49)
2016-04-07HouseSpecial Order until 4/8 (Delegate Frick) Adopted
2016-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2016-03-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2016-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2016-03-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {604637/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-02-26SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0175&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0175f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0175t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_659_sb0175t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0175_60463701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb0175.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0175_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0175_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0175,s-0425&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0175,h-1173&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback