MD SB175 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the second Thursday in May as Maryland Centenarians Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Centenarians Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-02SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 199
2013-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2013-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2013-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-08HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2013-04-05HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2013-03-29HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2013-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2013-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {724737/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2013-01-31SenateHearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
2013-01-17SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0175&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/sb/sb0175f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/sb/sb0175t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/Chapters_noln/CH_199_sb0175t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0175_72473701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb0175.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/sb0175_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/sb0175_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0175,s-0806&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0175,h-1331&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments

feedback