MD SB173 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain individuals to satisfy the requirement to possess and display a driver's license while driving a motor vehicle by carrying and displaying a certain recall notice issued under the Act within the previous 10 days; requiring a law enforcement officer who confiscates an individual's driver's license for certain reasons to provide the holder of the license with a certain recall notice; and requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop the form for the recall notice and provide the form to law enforcement agencies.
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses Confiscated for Real ID Compliance – Issuance and Display of Recall Notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {168770/1 Adopted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB28 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 610
Subjects
Communications
Disclosure
Drivers' Licenses
Emergency Bills
Forms
Identification
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Disclosure
Drivers' Licenses
Emergency Bills
Forms
Identification
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 16 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 16 | 112.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |