MD SB172 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a case involving a child, or the District Court at a bail review or preliminary hearing involving a child, to order a specified child to be held in a secure juvenile facility pending a specified transfer determination except under specified circumstances; requiring the District Court to state the reasons on the record for a finding that detention in a secure juvenile facility would pose a substantial risk of harm to the child or others; etc.
Title
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-22) (Y: 117 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (117-22) |
2015-04-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-04-11 | House | Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-04-11 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2015-04-08 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {378779/1 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {378779/1 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Bail
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
District Courts
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Pretrial Detention or Release
Safety
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
District Courts
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Pretrial Detention or Release
Safety