MD SB17 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a requirement that the Maryland Health Care Commission adopt certain regulations for the privacy and security of protected health information obtained or released through a health information exchange; altering the definition of a "health information exchange" to include an entity that governs, as well as one that provides, certain processes related to health care information; repealing a certain provision of law prohibiting certain regulations from applying to certain protected health information; etc.
Title
Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and Regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {187172/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Interest
Patients
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Electronic Communication
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Interest
Patients
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology