MD SB17 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from 1 year to 5 years, the number of years after the date of an open session a public body is required to keep a copy of minutes of the open session and any recording made under specified provisions of law; requiring specified public bodies to post online minutes or recordings, to the extent practicable; providing that a public body need not prepare minutes of an open session if live and archived video or audio streaming is available, or the public body votes on legislation and the votes are posted promptly on the Internet; etc.
Title
Open Meetings Act - Retention of Minutes and Recordings - Revision
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2016-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-15 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {234235/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Electronic Government
Inspections
Legislation
Notices
Privacy
Public Information
Recordings
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Video
Voting
Electronic Government
Inspections
Legislation
Notices
Privacy
Public Information
Recordings
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Video
Voting