MD SB169 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Dental Action Coalition to conduct a study to determine the annual cost of emergency room visits to treat dental conditions of specified adults and whether it is advisable to expand benefits for dental services for specified adults under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; authorizing the Coalition to report to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the General Assembly the findings of the study by December 1, 2017 and distribute the report to specified stakeholders; etc.
Title
Health - Cost of Emergency Room Visits to Treat Dental Conditions and Coverage of Dental Services Under Medicaid - Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) |
2017-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment {433522/2 (Delegate McKay) Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {227279/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Dentists
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
General Assembly
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Patients
Prices
Public Health
Reports
Dentists
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
General Assembly
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Patients
Prices
Public Health
Reports