MD SB169 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a local board of elections to commence the canvass of vote-by-mail ballots cast in a special election conducted by mail at 2 p.m. on the day of the special election; authorizing the State Board of Elections to adopt regulations authorizing a local board to commence the canvass of vote-by-mail ballots before 2 p.m. on the day of the special election; requiring the State Board to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Title
Special Elections - Voting by Mail - Canvass of Votes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-33) (Y: 101 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-33) |
2016-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-30 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-10 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-26 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {254233/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m. |
2016-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Ballots
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Postal Service
Privacy
Rules and Regulations
Time
Voting
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Postal Service
Privacy
Rules and Regulations
Time
Voting