MD SB169 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a homestead exemption that an individual may claim in a specified bankruptcy proceeding; clarifying that the exemption for an individual debtor's aggregate interest in owner-occupied real property includes a condominium unit; and authorizing an individual debtor to exempt the debtor's aggregate interest in a cooperative housing corporation that owns property that the owner occupies as a residence.
Title
Bankruptcy - Homestead Exemption - Debtor's Residence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (105-30) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-03 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-02-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/3 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-24 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |