MD SB167 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Anne Arundel County to enact a local law that authorizes secondary employment of county police officers.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Police Officers - Secondary Employment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Counties - Local Laws
Ethics
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Work, Labor and Employment
Counties - Local Laws
Ethics
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Work, Labor and Employment