MD SB163 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB110

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Medical Assistance Program Doula Pilot Program to be administered by the Maryland Department of Health and to provide doula services to program recipients in Baltimore City, Charles County, and Prince George's County who are pregnant or postpartum; requiring the Department to evaluate the effectiveness of the Pilot Program and to report by June 1, 2023, 2024, and 2025, to the Governor and General Assembly on the implementation of the Pilot Program and whether the State should expand the Pilot Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24HouseHearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-20HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-03-19SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2021-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {107677/1 Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-12-23SenateHearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Finance
2020-11-01SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB110 (Carry Over) 2019-12-20 - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General15141.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback