MD SB162 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, without liability for the termination and on 30 days' notice to the contractor, the board of directors of a condominium to terminate a contract entered into by the developer, officers, or previous board of directors within 180 days after the board is elected at a meeting at which the unit owners elect a majority of the board of directors composed of members unaffiliated with the developer; etc.
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Transition of Control - Termination of Contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-7) (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-18 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-7) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {218578/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Cable Television
Condominiums
Contracts
Homeowners Associations
Liability
Notices
Real Property
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Condominiums
Contracts
Homeowners Associations
Liability
Notices
Real Property
Telecommunications and Information Technology