MD SB161 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the forfeiture of specified property under specified circumstances; repealing a specified provision authorizing the forfeiture of specified money or weapons relating to possession of a controlled dangerous substance; requiring that a specified seizing authority provide a receipt for property on seizure that includes specified information; requiring that a specified seizing authority mail notice with specified information to the owner of seized property within a specified period of time; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-8) (Y: 133 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-28SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
2016-04-11SenatePassed Enrolled
2016-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed (133-8)
2016-04-11HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2016-04-11SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2016-04-11HouseDelegates Vallario, Sydnor, and Moon
2016-04-11HouseConference Committee Appointed
2016-04-11HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2016-04-08SenateSenators Hough, Muse, and Raskin
2016-04-08SenateConference Committee Appointed
2016-04-08SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2016-04-08SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2016-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1)
2016-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-04HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Vallario) {273523/1 Adopted
2016-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {502316/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2016-03-31HouseHearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-11HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2016-03-10SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2016-03-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {478474/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2016-02-11SenateHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-15SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0161?ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0161f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0161t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0161e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_658_sb0161e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0161_47847401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0161_27352301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0161_50231601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0161_67382701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0161_88352301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb0161.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0161_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0161_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0161_88352301.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0161,s-0484&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0161,h-1000&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0161,s-1324&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0161,h-1421&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback