MD SB160 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB293
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt any migratory game birds on Sundays during the open season on certain private property or on public land designated for Sunday hunting by the Department.
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB293 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |