MD SB16 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that a firearm application contain a copy of the applicant's handgun qualification license; and requiring that a firearm application contain the applicant's handgun qualification license number, with a specified exception.
Title
Public Safety - Firearm Application
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-07-18 | Senate | Pre-filed |