MD SB159 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person who is cited for unlawfully catching oysters may have a specified license revoked under specified circumstances; establishing grounds for license revocation; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to hold a hearing under specified circumstances in accordance with the Administrative Procedure Act; requiring the Department to revoke a person's license to catch oysters under specified circumstances; and prohibiting a person from engaging or working in a specified fishery under specified circumstances.
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Hearing
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Brian Frosh [D] |
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {293820/1 Rejected (Y: 12 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {293820/1 Rejected (Y: 12 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (126-13) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2011-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-02-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) Withdrawn | |
2011-02-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Astle) Withdrawn | |
2011-02-22 | Special Order until 2/23 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted | |
2011-02-22 | Floor Amendment (Senator Astle) | |
2011-02-17 | Special Order until 2/22 (Senator Conway) Adopted | |
2011-02-16 | Special Order until 2/17 (Senator Colburn) Adopted | |
2011-02-16 | Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Rejected (12-34) | |
2011-02-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-02-15 | Laid Over (Senator Colburn) Adopted | |
2011-02-15 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-02-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-24 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |