MD SB158 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the basis for calculating a specified license fee credited to the Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund; and extending the deadline from June 30, 2017 to June 30, 2019, by which the owner of a specified eligible heating oil tank may apply for reimbursement of specified costs from the Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund.
Title
Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-13) (Y: 125 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-13) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Fees
Fuel
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Fees
Fuel
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes