MD SB156 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified provisions of law govern the nomination and election of judges of the orphans' court in Baltimore County; authorizing a candidate for judge of the orphans' court in Baltimore County to file and appear on primary election ballots; requiring that the three candidates of each principal political party receiving the largest number of votes in the primary election appear on the general election ballot; prohibiting the political affiliation of candidates from being included on the general election ballot; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Ballots
Baltimore County
Elections
Judges
Orphans' Court
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Public Officials
Baltimore County
Elections
Judges
Orphans' Court
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Public Officials