MD SB155 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring school vehicles registered in the State and purchased on or after July 1, 2018, regardless of the date the school vehicle was manufactured or assembled, to be equipped with specified seat belts for every seat on the school vehicle; and providing for the application of specified requirements relating to seat belts on school vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Vehicles - Seat Belts - Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-06SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-01-25SenateHearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback