MD SB151 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a disciplinary committee of the State Board of Nursing to grant and deny licenses and certificates and take specified disciplinary action against licensees and certificate holders; authorizing the Board to establish one or more disciplinary committees to conduct specified hearings and issue final decisions or orders under specified provisions of law; authorizing the Board to delegate authority to conduct a hearing and issue a final decision or order to a disciplinary committee; etc.
Title
State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - Revisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Contests
Discipline
Emergency Bills
Evidence
Fines
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Hearings
Judicial Review
Licenses
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Penalties and Sentences
Time
Contests
Discipline
Emergency Bills
Evidence
Fines
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Hearings
Judicial Review
Licenses
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Penalties and Sentences
Time