MD SB150 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, beginning January 1, 2023, and subject to certain limitations, to provide certain dental care for adults whose annual income is at or below 133 percent of the federal poverty level; and repealing certain provisions of law requiring the implementation of a pilot program to provide limited dental coverage to adult recipients under the Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14SenateHearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12SenateFirst Reading Finance
2021-10-28SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB6 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-12 - First Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General15103(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General15141(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback