MD SB150 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating in Dorchester County a refillable container license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to holders of specified alcoholic beverages licenses; specifying that a holder of the refillable container license may sell draft beer for consumption off the licensed premises in a specified refillable container; prohibiting a holder of a refillable container license to display or provide shelving for beer for off-premises consumption; etc.
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-22 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Advertising
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Dorchester County
Fees
Hearings
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Dorchester County
Fees
Hearings
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Rules and Regulations