MD SB147 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Steering Committee of the Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators; and requiring the Steering Committee to review, or request that the Alliance review, the content and monitor the implementation of the training objectives and curriculum adopted by the Police Training Commission for a community inclusion training program at least once every 4 years or more frequently if requested by the Commission.
Title
Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators - Membership and Duties - Community Inclusion Training Oversight
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2016-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-24 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {887479/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Disabled
Education
Job Training
Public Safety
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Disabled
Education
Job Training
Public Safety