MD SB147 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers and Home Inspectors to adopt regulations to require a demonstration of continuing professional competency of up to 30 educational hours as a condition of renewal of a home inspector license; providing for the implementation of the continuing professional competency requirement on a phased-in basis; and providing that specified educational hours from courses offered by specified entities satisfy the continuing professional competence requirement under specified circumstances.
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers and Home Inspectors - Home
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Kramer) Adopted | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-15 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-21 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-05 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (35-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-02-18 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-02-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-02-14 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-24 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Appraisals
Committees and Commissions
Education
Housing
Inspections
Licenses
Real Estate
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Committees and Commissions
Education
Housing
Inspections
Licenses
Real Estate
Real Property
Rules and Regulations