MD SB146 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB315

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Hearing: Jan 18 @ 1:00 pm Senate Judicial Proceedings Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from stopping, standing, or parking a vehicle that is not a plug-in electric drive vehicle in a parking space that is designated by certain signage for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles; requiring that a parking space for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles be counted as part of the overall number of parking spaces for certain purposes; authorizing the towing or removal of certain vehicles; establishing a civil penalty of $50 for a violation of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-05SenateHearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2021-10-12SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB315 (Carry Over) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation11145.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation211003.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback