MD SB145 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Hearing: Feb 2 @ 2:00 pm Senate Judicial Proceedings Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a member of a cooperative housing corporation to pay up to $10,000 of the corporation's property or liability insurance deductible if damage to a common element originated in the member's unit; requiring the governing body to inform each member annually of the member's responsibility regarding the insurance deductible and the amount; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cooperative Housing Corporations – Property Insurance Deductibles – Member Responsibility

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13SenateHearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
2022-01-13SenateHearing canceled
2022-01-10SenateHearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2021-10-19SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB197 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Corporations and Associations56B-01(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations56B-32(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations56B-33(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback