MD SB145 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing personal liability of persons who exercise specified control over the fiscal management of limited liability companies and limited liability partnerships for payment of the motor fuel tax, interest, and penalties under specified circumstances.
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Personal Liability - Limited Liability Companies and Limited
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-17 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-02-16 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-02-14 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-02-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-24 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |