MD SB142 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB76
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing November 1 as the legal State holiday of Maryland Emancipation Day; and making Maryland Emancipation Day a public school holiday, a bank holiday, and a State employee holiday.
Title
Legal Holiday - Maryland Emancipation Day - Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
2020-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB76 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 5 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 1 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 9 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0142?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0142f.pdf |