MD SB142 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a custodian of records to permit inspection of a complaint filed with the Internal Investigations Division of the Baltimore Police Department and all documents relating to the complaint.
Title
Inspection of Public Records - Internal Investigations Division of the Baltimore Police Department
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Public Information
Public Safety
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
State Police, Department of
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Public Information
Public Safety
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
State Police, Department of