MD SB142 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Secretary of Agriculture to establish a farm quarantine for a specified purpose on a farm infected or infested with a pathogen; authorizing the Secretary to examine specified practices in accordance with specified standards, designate a specified person to conduct a specified inspection, and accept specified assistance from specified federal agencies; requiring the Secretary to deny access to specified information subject to a specified exception; etc.
Title
Secretary of Agriculture - Farm Food Safety
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-24 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-22 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-21 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-01-19 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-18 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Disclosure
Diseases
Farmland
Federal Government
Health
Hearings
Inspections
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Public Information
Safety
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Disclosure
Diseases
Farmland
Federal Government
Health
Hearings
Inspections
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Public Information
Safety