MD SB140 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the size of the safety zone to 50 yards for archery hunters in Washington County within which archery hunting may not take place except under certain circumstances; and requiring that an archery hunter in Washington County be in an elevated position when hunting any wild bird or mammal within 50 to 100 yards of certain buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (135-3)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-20HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-18HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-02-15SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-02-13SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-13SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-13SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-23SenateHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback