MD SB140 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that a holder of a Class C per diem beer license, a Class C per diem beer and wine license, or a Class C per diem beer, wine, and liquor license may cater an event conducted by a club at the place described in the license on certain days.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dorchester County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class C Per Diem Licenses – Catering Club Events

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 57
2018-03-30SenateReturned Passed
2018-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-28HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-13HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-08SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-23SenateHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-12SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback