MD SB14 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Public Health Services in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to conduct a study of safe and healthy school hours for Maryland public schools, consult with specified persons, and make recommendations relating to alternative school day starting times for Maryland public schools; and requiring the Office of Public Health Services to submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2014; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Study of Safe and Healthy School Hours for Maryland Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {934239/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education, State Department of
Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Students
Sunset
Education
Education, State Department of
Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Students
Sunset