MD SB14 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring law enforcement officers to record data pertaining to traffic stops; requiring law enforcement agencies to report the information to the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center (MSAC); requiring the Police Training Commission to develop guidelines and a model format to record data; requiring the MSAC to report to the Police Training Commission those law enforcement agencies that fail to comply with the reporting requirements; providing exceptions for law enforcement agencies subject to specified agreements; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate Concur - House Amendments (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Floor Amendment (Cluster) {623429/1 Rejected (Y: 48 N: 86 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate Concur - House Amendments (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Floor Amendment (Cluster) {623429/1 Rejected (Y: 48 N: 86 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (94-42) | |
2011-04-04 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Cluster) Rejected (48-86) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-27 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-05 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (36-11) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Concur - House Amendments (35-12) | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (31-15) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Robey) Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-01-14 | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-14 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Arrests
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Discrimination
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Minorities
Police Training Commission
Records
Reports
Search and Seizure
State Police, Department of
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Traffic Regulation
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Discrimination
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Minorities
Police Training Commission
Records
Reports
Search and Seizure
State Police, Department of
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Traffic Regulation