MD SB138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Including the crime of stalking in the list of charges to which a certain prohibition against violating a certain condition of pretrial or posttrial release is applicable.
Title
Stalking – Violation of Conditions of Release
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {668770/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Harassment
Parole and Probation
Pretrial Detention or Release
Public Safety
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Harassment
Parole and Probation
Pretrial Detention or Release
Public Safety